Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hugh John O’Neill

Deceased

Coadjutor Bishop Emeritus of Dunedin, New Zealand

Titular Bishop of Bareta


from Cathedral Web Site

Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jun 1898Born
31 Jul 192123.0Ordained PriestPriest of Dunedin, New Zealand
12 Jan 194344.5AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Dunedin, New Zealand
12 Jan 194344.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Bareta
25 Mar 194344.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bareta
2 Mar 194950.6ResignedCoadjutor Bishop of Dunedin, New Zealand
27 Dec 195557.4DiedCoadjutor Bishop Emeritus of Dunedin, New Zealand

MicroData Summary for Hugh John O’Neill
Bishop Hugh John O’Neill (born , died ) Coadjutor Bishop Emeritus of Dunedin

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDunedin

  • a priest for 34.4 years
  • a bishop for 12.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1943, Number 15
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 160, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018