Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop James Patrick Carroll

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Sydney

Titular Archbishop of Amasea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Dec 1908BornEnmore
30 May 193122.4Ordained PriestPriest of Sydney, Australia
6 Jan 195445.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Sydney, Australia
6 Jan 195445.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Atenia
24 Feb 195445.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Atenia
15 Oct 196556.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Amasea
23 Jul 198475.6RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Sydney, Australia
14 Jan 199586.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Sydney, Australia

MicroData Summary for James Patrick Carroll:
Archbishop James Patrick Carroll (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Sydney

  • a priest for 63.6 years
  • a bishop for 40.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015