Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joércio Gonçalves Pereira, C.SS.R.

Prelate Emeritus of Coari, Amazonas, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Sep 1953 Born
31 Jul 198228.9Solemn VowsMember of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
26 Feb 198329.4Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
30 Nov 200552.2AppointedCoadjutor Prelate of Coari, Amazonas, Brazil
25 Feb 200652.4Ordained BishopCoadjutor Prelate of Coari, Amazonas, Brazil
28 Feb 200753.4SucceededPrelate of Coari, Amazonas, Brazil
22 Jul 200955.8ResignedPrelate of Coari, Amazonas, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Joércio Gonçalves Pereira
Bishop Joércio Gonçalves Pereira C.SS.R. (born ) Prelate Emeritus of Coari

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVirginia

Please contact the Bishop through the Territorial Prelature of Coari.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 30 Nov 2005
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 184, Number 15,071
  • s: Bollettino, 28 Feb 2007
  • r: Bollettino, 22 Jul 2009
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast