Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Irineu Silvio Wilges, O.F.M.

Bishop Emeritus of Cachoeira do Sul, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Oct 1936 Born
15 Jul 196225.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
14 Jun 200063.6AppointedBishop of Cachoeira do Sul, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
12 Aug 200063.8Ordained BishopBishop of Cachoeira do Sul, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
28 Dec 201175.2RetiredBishop of Cachoeira do Sul, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Irineu Silvio Wilges
Bishop Irineu Silvio Wilges O.F.M. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Cachoeira do Sul

EventPlace
Birth PlacePinheiral

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Cachoeira do Sul.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 28 Dec 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 160, Number 13,817
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast