Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Mikołaj Ignacy Wyżycki

Deceased

Archbishop of Lviv


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Nov 1698BornTarnogoren
28 Oct 172324.9Ordained PriestPriest
6 May 173738.5AppointedArchbishop of Lviv, Ukraine
7 Jul 173738.6Ordained BishopArchbishop of Lviv, Ukraine
7 Apr 175758.4DiedArchbishop of Lviv, Ukraine

MicroData Summary for Mikołaj Ignacy Wyżycki:
Archbishop Mikołaj Ignacy Wyżycki (born , died ) Archbishop of Lviv

  • a priest for 33.4 years
  • a bishop for 19.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,870
  • b: JPG
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 3 May 2015