Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franciszek Kazimierz Dowgiałło Zawisza

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Inflanty (Livonia)-Pilten

Titular Bishop of Evaria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jun 1702BornSzakinowicz
25 Sep 172523.2Ordained DeaconDeacon
28 Oct 172523.3Ordained PriestPriest
13 Apr 174441.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Inflanty (Livonia)-Pilten, Poland
13 Apr 174441.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Evaria
19 Jul 174442.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Evaria
2 Jun 176663.9DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Inflanty (Livonia)-Pilten, Poland

Note(s): ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Franciszek Kazimierz Dowgiałło Zawisza:
Bishop Franciszek Kazimierz Dowgiałło Zawisza (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Inflanty (Livonia)-Pilten

  • a priest for 40.5 years
  • a bishop for 21.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 211, and Page 454
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1744, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015