Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Adam Augustyn Wessel, O. Cist. †

Deceased

Bishop of Kamyanets-Podilskyi (Kamieniec)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Mar 1678BornCzervicz
25 Aug 170628.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Cistercians
19 Dec 172244.7SelectedBishop of Inflanty (Livonia)-Pilten, Poland
12 Jun 172446.2ConfirmedBishop of Inflanty (Livonia)-Pilten, Poland
6 Aug 172446.4Ordained BishopBishop of Inflanty (Livonia)-Pilten, Poland
11 May 173355.1AppointedBishop of Kamyanets-Podilskyi (Kamieniec), Ukraine
11 Feb 173556.9DiedBishop of Kamyanets-Podilskyi (Kamieniec), Ukraine

MicroData Summary for Adam Augustyn Wessel:
Bishop Adam Augustyn Wessel O. Cist. (born , died ) Bishop of Kamyanets-Podilskyi (Kamieniec)

  • a priest for 28.5 years
  • a bishop for 10.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 408
  • b/c2+: CB, 2 Jan 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 217, Number 18,030

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 30 Mar 2014