Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Maciej Aleksander Sołtyk

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm)

Titular Bishop of Mactaris


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Feb 1679³BornBuszcze
1 May 170627.1Ordained PriestPriest of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland
7 Feb 172949.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland
7 Feb 172949.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Mactaris
27 Mar 172950.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mactaris
8 Dec 174970.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Maciej Aleksander Sołtyk:
Bishop Maciej Aleksander Sołtyk (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm)

  • a priest for 43.6 years
  • a bishop for 20.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bisch÷fe des Heiligen R÷mischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 256
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1729, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015