Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Walenty Alexander Czapski, O. Cist. †

Deceased

Bishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Feb 1682³BornSmentowo
11 Feb 173754.9AppointedBishop of Przemyśl, Poland
16 Jun 173755.3Ordained BishopBishop of Przemyśl, Poland
2 May 174159.1SelectedBishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland
20 Dec 174159.8ConfirmedBishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland
4 Mar 175169.0DiedBishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Walenty Alexander Czapski:
Bishop Walenty Alexander Czapski O. Cist. (born , died ) Bishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze)

  • a bishop for 13.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 348, and Page 444
  • ob/c23: CB, 30 Jun 2015
  • b: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1737, Number 15
  • ob/c23: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 224, Number 18,526

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015