Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marcin Załuski

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Płock


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Dec 1700³BornSturmbueblensi
17 Sep 172827.8Ordained DeaconDeacon
26 Sep 172827.8Ordained PriestPriest
7 May 173231.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Płock, Poland
7 May 173231.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Draso
7 Sep 173231.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Draso
12 Nov 176362.9ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Płock, Poland
12 Nov 176362.9ResignedTitular Bishop of Draso
17 Jun 176766.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Płock, Poland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Marcin Załuski:
Bishop Marcin Załuski (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Płock

  • a priest for 38.7 years
  • a bishop for 34.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 189, Number 15,382
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 335
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 200, and Page 454

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 30 Mar 2014