Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Bernard McDowell

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania

Titular Bishop of Tamazuca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jul 1921BornNew Castle
4 Nov 194524.3Ordained PriestPriest of Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania, USA
19 Jul 196645.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania, USA
19 Jul 196645.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Tamazuca
8 Sep 196645.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tamazuca
9 Sep 199675.1RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania, USA
25 Feb 201088.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania, USA

MicroData Summary for John Bernard McDowell:
Bishop John Bernard McDowell (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Pittsburgh

  • a priest for 64.3 years
  • a bishop for 43.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 22 Mar 2014