Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Joseph Tobin

Bishop of Providence, Rhode Island, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Apr 1948 Born
21 Jul 197325.3Ordained PriestPriest of Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania, USA
3 Nov 199244.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania, USA
3 Nov 199244.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Novica
27 Dec 199244.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Novica
5 Dec 199547.6AppointedBishop of Youngstown, Ohio, USA
2 Feb 199647.8InstalledBishop of Youngstown, Ohio, USA
31 Mar 200556.9AppointedBishop of Providence, Rhode Island, USA
31 May 200557.1InstalledBishop of Providence, Rhode Island, USA

MicroData Summary for Thomas Joseph Tobin
Bishop Thomas Joseph Tobin (born ) Bishop of Providence

EventPlace
Birth PlacePittsburgh

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Providence.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132, Number 11,936

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast