Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Anthony Gerard Bosco

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Greensburg, Pennsylvania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Aug 1927BornNew Castle
7 Jun 195224.8Ordained PriestPriest of Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania, USA
14 May 197042.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania, USA
14 May 197042.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Labicum
30 Jun 197042.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Labicum
2 Apr 198759.6AppointedBishop of Greensburg, Pennsylvania, USA
30 Jun 198759.9InstalledBishop of Greensburg, Pennsylvania, USA
2 Jan 200476.4RetiredBishop of Greensburg, Pennsylvania, USA
2 Jul 201385.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Greensburg, Pennsylvania, USA

MicroData Summary for Anthony Gerard Bosco:
Bishop Anthony Gerard Bosco (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Greensburg

  • a priest for 61.0 years
  • a bishop for 43.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 3 Jul 2013
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 24 Apr 2015