Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul Joseph Bradley

Bishop of Kalamazoo, Michigan


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Oct 1945 BornMcKeesport
1 May 197125.5Ordained PriestPriest of Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania, USA
16 Dec 200459.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania, USA
16 Dec 200459.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Afufenia
2 Feb 200559.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Afufenia
6 Apr 200963.5AppointedBishop of Kalamazoo, Michigan, USA
5 Jun 200963.6InstalledBishop of Kalamazoo, Michigan, USA

MicroData Summary for Paul Joseph Bradley:
Bishop Paul Joseph Bradley (born ) Bishop of Kalamazoo

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Kalamazoo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 178, Number 14,819
  • ab: Bollettino, 6 Apr 2009

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013