Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Mathias Lenihan

Deceased

Bishop of Cheyenne, Wyoming, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Aug 1844Born
19 Nov 186824.2Ordained PriestPriest
18 Dec 189652.3AppointedBishop of Cheyenne, Wyoming, USA
24 Feb 189752.5Ordained BishopBishop of Cheyenne, Wyoming, USA
15 Dec 190157.3DiedBishop of Cheyenne, Wyoming, USA

MicroData Summary for Thomas Mathias Lenihan
Bishop Thomas Mathias Lenihan (born , died ) Bishop of Cheyenne

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMallow, Diocese of Cloyne and Ross, Ireland
Ordained BishopSt. Raphael, Cathedral, Dubuque, Archdiocese of Dubuque, Iowa

  • a priest for 33.0 years
  • a bishop for 4.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 199
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1897, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast