Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James Joseph Davis

Deceased

Bishop of Davenport, Iowa, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Aug 1851Born
21 Jun 187826.8Ordained PriestPriest of Davenport, Iowa, USA
14 Sep 190453.0AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Davenport, Iowa, USA
14 Sep 190453.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Milopotamos
30 Nov 190453.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Milopotamos
22 Dec 190655.3SucceededBishop of Davenport, Iowa, USA
2 Dec 192675.2DiedBishop of Davenport, Iowa, USA

MicroData Summary for James Joseph Davis
Bishop James Joseph Davis (born , died ) Bishop of Davenport

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTinvaun, Dunawaggen, Ireland

  • a priest for 48.4 years
  • a bishop for 22.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1904, Number 64
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 252, and Page 154

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast