Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ramón Antonio Linares Sandoval

Bishop Emeritus of Barinas

Apostolic Administrator of Acarigua-Araure


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Dec 1936 BornSan Carlos
28 Jul 196326.6Ordained PriestPriest of Valencia en Venezuela
5 Jul 199457.5AppointedBishop of Puerto Cabello, Venezuela
15 Oct 199457.8Ordained BishopBishop of Puerto Cabello, Venezuela
16 Jul 200265.6AppointedBishop of Barinas, Venezuela
30 Aug 201376.7RetiredBishop of Barinas, Venezuela
31 Oct 201376.8AppointedApostolic Administrator of Acarigua-Araure, Venezuela

MicroData Summary for Ramón Antonio Linares Sandoval:
Bishop Ramón Antonio Linares Sandoval (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Barinas

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Barinas.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 140, Number 12,446
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • r: Bollettino, 30 Aug 2013
  • ab: CB, 18 Dec 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 18 Dec 2013