Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop François Laurencin

Deceased

Apostolic Administrator of Guadeloupe et Basse-Terre, Guadeloupe

Titular Archbishop of Anazarbus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jan 1825BornMottier, France
19 Feb 185328.1Ordained PriestPriest
1 Jun 188863.4AppointedApostolic Administrator of Guadeloupe et Basse-Terre, Guadeloupe, Antilles
1 Jun 188863.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Anazarbus
1 May 188964.3Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Anazarbus
18 Dec 189267.9DiedApostolic Administrator of Guadeloupe et Basse-Terre, Guadeloupe, Antilles

MicroData Summary for François Laurencin:
Archbishop François Laurencin (born , died ) Apostolic Administrator of Guadeloupe et Basse-Terre

  • a priest for 39.8 years
  • a bishop for 3.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 99, and Page 293

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013