Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franciscus Kopong Kung

Bishop of Larantuka, Indonesia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Aug 1950 Born
29 Jun 198231.9Ordained PriestPriest of Larantuka, Indonesia
2 Oct 200151.1AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Larantuka, Indonesia
10 Jan 200251.4Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Larantuka, Indonesia
16 Jun 200453.8SucceededBishop of Larantuka, Indonesia

MicroData Summary for Franciscus Kopong Kung
Bishop Franciscus Kopong Kung (born ) Bishop of Larantuka

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLamika

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Larantuka.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 166, Number 14,112

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast