Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Philip Saklil

Deceased

Bishop of Timika, Indonesia

Apostolic Administrator of Merauke


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Mar 1960Born
23 Oct 198828.5Ordained PriestPriest of Jayapura, Indonesia
19 Dec 200343.7AppointedBishop of Timika, Indonesia
18 Apr 200444.0Ordained BishopBishop of Timika, Indonesia
27 Jul 201959.3AppointedApostolic Administrator of Merauke, Indonesia
3 Aug 201959.3DiedBishop of Timika, Indonesia

MicroData Summary for John Philip Saklil
Bishop John Philip Saklil (born , died ) Bishop of Timika

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKokonao
Ordained BishopTown Hall, Timika, Diocese of Timika

  • a priest for 30.7 years
  • a bishop for 15.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 175, Number 14,576
  • aadm/d: CB, 3 Aug 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast