Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Jayapura

Dioecesis Iayapuraensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Name Changed: 22 August 1973
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Merauke
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Indonesia
  • Square Kilometers: 115,349 (44,553 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Keuskupan, Kotak Pos 1379, Jl. Kesehatan 4, Dok II, Jayapura 99112, Irian Jaya, Indonesia
  • Telephone: (0967)536.411; 533.092
  • Fax: 536.427

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Hollandia
12 May 1949ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Nuova Guinea Olandese Prefecture Apostolic of Hollandia (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Hollandia
14 June 1954ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Hollandia Vicariate Apostolic of Hollandia
19 December 1959Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Hollandia Prefecture Apostolic of Manokwari (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Kota Baru
28 June 1963Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Hollandia Vicariate Apostolic of Kota Baru
Vicariate Apostolic of Sukarnapura
12 June 1964Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Kota Baru Vicariate Apostolic of Sukarnapura
Diocese of Sukarnapura
15 November 1966ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Sukarnapura Diocese of Sukarnapura
Diocese of Djajapura
25 April 1969Name ChangedDiocese of Sukarnapura Diocese of Djajapura
Diocese of Jayapura
22 August 1973Name ChangedDiocese of Djajapura Diocese of Jayapura
19 December 2003Territory LostDiocese of Jayapura Diocese of Timika (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Prefecture Apostolic of Hollandia
19505,175170,0003.0%2525207715ap1951
Vicariate Apostolic of Hollandia
Vicariate Apostolic of Kota Baru
Vicariate Apostolic of Sukarnapura
Diocese of Sukarnapura
Diocese of Djajapura
196927,752400,0006.9%14950555622532ap1971
Diocese of Jayapura
198046,504650,0007.2%43431,081614632ap1981
199075,478960,0007.9%734411,8401755242ap1991
1999128,9841,275,00010.1%1533482,6872764642ap2000
2000129,1801,275,00010.1%1533482,6912764642ap2001
2001332,2311,356,14424.5%1438526,3893848938ap2002
2002335,7311,490,12722.5%1544595,69028113444ap2003
2003129,9282,469,7865.3%1835532,45121457242ap2004
200444,880837,3005.4%1118291,5472995625ap2005
200665,180858,0007.6%1324371,76111026025ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2011
code: v2.7.5, 23 Nov 2011; data: 5 Dec 2011