Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jacques-Alexis Jacquemin

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Saint-Dié


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Aug 1750BornNancy
24 Sep 177424.1Ordained PriestPriest
14 Oct 182373.2SelectedBishop of Saint-Dié, France
17 Nov 182373.3ConfirmedBishop of Saint-Dié, France
18 Jan 182473.5Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Dié, France
16 Jun 183079.9RetiredBishop of Saint-Dié, France
15 Jun 183281.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Saint-Dié, France

MicroData Summary for Jacques-Alexis Jacquemin:
Bishop Jacques-Alexis Jacquemin (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Saint-Dié

  • a priest for 57.7 years
  • a bishop for 8.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 174

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013