Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Wilhelm Emmanuel von Ketteler

Deceased

Bishop of Mainz


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Dec 1811BornMünster
1 Jun 184432.4Ordained PriestPriest of Münster, Germany
20 May 185038.4AppointedBishop of Mainz, Germany
25 Jul 185038.6Ordained BishopBishop of Mainz, Germany
13 Jul 187765.6DiedBishop of Mainz, Germany

MicroData Summary for Wilhelm Emmanuel von Ketteler:
Bishop Wilhelm Emmanuel von Ketteler (born , died ) Bishop of Mainz

  • a priest for 33.1 years
  • a bishop for 27.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 389

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013