Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Matthias Eberhard

Deceased

Bishop of Trier


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Nov 1815BornTrier
12 Jan 183923.2Ordained DeaconDeacon of Trier, Germany
23 Feb 183923.3Ordained PriestPriest of Trier, Germany
7 Apr 186246.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Trier, Germany
7 Apr 186246.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Paneade
3 Aug 186246.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Paneade
16 Jul 186751.7SelectedBishop of Trier, Germany
20 Sep 186751.9ConfirmedBishop of Trier, Germany
13 Nov 186752.0InstalledBishop of Trier, Germany
30 May 187660.6DiedBishop of Trier, Germany

MicroData Summary for Matthias Eberhard:
Bishop Matthias Eberhard (born , died ) Bishop of Trier

  • a priest for 37.3 years
  • a bishop for 13.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 437, and Page 564

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013