Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Elmar Fischer

Bishop Emeritus of Feldkirch


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Oct 1936 BornFeldkirch
29 Jun 196124.7Ordained PriestPriest of Feldkirch, Austria
24 May 200568.6AppointedBishop of Feldkirch, Austria
3 Jul 200568.7Ordained BishopBishop of Feldkirch, Austria
15 Nov 201175.1RetiredBishop of Feldkirch, Austria

MicroData Summary for Elmar Fischer:
Bishop Elmar Fischer (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Feldkirch

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Feldkirch.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 15 Nov 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 180, Number 14,912

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013