Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franz Scharl

Auxiliary Bishop of Wien {Vienna}, Austria

Titular Bishop of Ierafi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Mar 1958 Born
29 Jun 199032.3Ordained PriestPriest of Wien {Vienna}, Austria
9 Feb 200647.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Wien {Vienna}, Austria
9 Feb 200647.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Ierafi
23 Apr 200648.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ierafi

MicroData Summary for Franz Scharl
Bishop Franz Scharl (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Wien {Vienna}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceObendorf

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Wien {Vienna}.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 9 Feb 2006
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 185, Number 15,140

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast