Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franz Egger

Deceased

Bishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Apr 1836Born
11 Nov 186024.5Ordained PriestPriest of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
12 Jun 190872.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
12 Jun 190872.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Laranda
14 Jun 190872.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Laranda
27 Sep 191276.4SelectedBishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
6 Nov 191276.5ConfirmedBishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
27 Nov 191276.5InstalledBishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
17 May 191882.0DiedBishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Franz Egger (VIAF: 62647364)
Bishop Franz Egger (born , died ) Bishop of Brixen {Bressanone}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHippach

  • a priest for 57.5 years
  • a bishop for 9.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 93
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1908, Number 42
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 5, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast