Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop David Raymond Choby

Deceased

Bishop of Nashville, Tennessee, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jan 1947Born
6 Sep 197427.6Ordained PriestPriest of Nashville, Tennessee, USA
20 Dec 200558.9AppointedBishop of Nashville, Tennessee, USA
27 Feb 200659.1Ordained BishopBishop of Nashville, Tennessee, USA
3 Jun 201770.3DiedBishop of Nashville, Tennessee, USA

MicroData Summary for David Raymond Choby
Bishop David Raymond Choby (born , died ) Bishop of Nashville

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNashville, Diocese of Nashville, Tennessee
Ordained PriestSt. Henry, Church, Nashville, Diocese of Nashville, Tennessee
Ordained BishopIncarnation, Cathedral, Nashville, Diocese of Nashville, Tennessee
Death PlaceSaint Thomas West, Hospital, Nashville, Diocese of Nashville, Tennessee

  • a priest for 42.7 years
  • a bishop for 11.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 20 Dec 2005
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 184, Number 15,081
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 234, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast