Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Karl Augustinus Kilian

Deceased

Bishop of Limburg


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Nov 1856BornEltville
29 Jun 188124.7Ordained PriestPriest of Limburg, Germany
22 Jan 191356.2SelectedBishop of Limburg, Germany
15 Jul 191356.7ConfirmedBishop of Limburg, Germany
8 Sep 191356.9Ordained BishopBishop of Limburg, Germany
30 Oct 193074.0DiedBishop of Limburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Karl Augustinus Kilian:
Bishop Karl Augustinus Kilian (born , died ) Bishop of Limburg

  • a priest for 49.3 years
  • a bishop for 17.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 168, Number 14,214
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1913, Number 48

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013