Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Georg Heinrich Maria Kirstein

Deceased

Bishop of Mainz, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jul 1858Born
14 Nov 188022.3Ordained PriestPriest of Mainz, Germany
30 Nov 190345.4SelectedBishop of Mainz, Germany
8 Feb 190445.5ConfirmedBishop of Mainz, Germany
19 Mar 190445.7Ordained BishopBishop of Mainz, Germany
15 Apr 192162.7DiedBishop of Mainz, Germany

MicroData Summary for Georg Heinrich Maria Kirstein (VIAF: 1203792)
Bishop Georg Heinrich Maria Kirstein (born , died ) Bishop of Mainz

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMainz

  • a priest for 40.4 years
  • a bishop for 17.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1904, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast