Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Christian Schreiber

Deceased

Bishop of Berlin, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Aug 1872Born
28 Oct 189826.2Ordained PriestPriest of Fulda, Germany
12 Aug 192149.0AppointedBishop of Meißen (Meissen), Germany
14 Sep 192149.1Ordained BishopBishop of Meißen (Meissen), Germany
13 Aug 193058.0AppointedBishop of Berlin, Germany
31 Aug 193058.0InstalledBishop of Berlin, Germany
1 Sep 193361.0DiedBishop of Berlin, Germany

MicroData Summary for Christian Schreiber
Bishop Christian Schreiber (born , died ) Bishop of Berlin

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSomborn

  • a priest for 34.8 years
  • a bishop for 11.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,921, Number 69

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast