Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Heinrich Machens

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Hildesheim

Titular Bishop of Bida


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jan 1919BornHildesheim
13 Mar 194930.1Ordained PriestPriest of Hildesheim, Germany
24 Mar 197657.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Hildesheim, Germany
24 Mar 197657.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Bida
7 Jun 197657.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bida
11 Feb 199475.0RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Hildesheim, Germany
17 Feb 200182.0DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Hildesheim, Germany

MicroData Summary for Heinrich Machens:
Bishop Heinrich Machens (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Hildesheim

  • a priest for 51.9 years
  • a bishop for 24.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 166, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015