Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Felix Alaba Adeosin Job

Archbishop Emeritus of Ibadan, Nigeria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jun 1938 Born
24 Dec 196628.5Ordained PriestPriest
11 Mar 197132.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Ibadan, Nigeria
11 Mar 197132.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Abthugni
4 Jul 197133.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Abthugni
5 Oct 197436.2AppointedBishop of Ibadan, Nigeria
26 Mar 199455.7AppointedArchbishop of Ibadan, Nigeria
29 Oct 201375.3RetiredArchbishop of Ibadan, Nigeria

MicroData Summary for Felix Alaba Adeosin Job
Archbishop Felix Alaba Adeosin Job (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Ibadan

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEsure

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Ibadan.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 29 Oct 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 26 Sep 2017