Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Peter Kayode Odetoyinbo

Bishop of Abeokuta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jan 1964 BornIbadan
7 Oct 198925.7Ordained PriestPriest of Ibadan, Nigeria
15 Apr 201450.2AppointedBishop of Abeokuta, Nigeria
25 Jun 201450.4Ordained BishopBishop of Abeokuta, Nigeria

MicroData Summary for Peter Kayode Odetoyinbo:
Bishop Peter Kayode Odetoyinbo (born ) Bishop of Abeokuta

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Abeokuta.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 15 Apr 2014
  • ob: CB, 30 Apr 2014
  • c2: CB, 25 Jun 2014
  • c3: CB, 26 Jun 2014
  • c4: CB, 27 Jun 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 28 Jun 2014