Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop John Kwao Amuzu Aggey

Deceased

Archbishop of Lagos


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Mar 1908BornAnecho
16 Apr 194436.1Ordained PriestPriest
26 Jan 195748.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lagos, Nigeria
26 Jan 195748.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Sigus
4 Aug 195749.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sigus
6 Jul 196557.3AppointedArchbishop of Lagos, Nigeria
13 Mar 197264.0DiedArchbishop of Lagos, Nigeria

MicroData Summary for John Kwao Amuzu Aggey:
Archbishop John Kwao Amuzu Aggey (born , died ) Archbishop of Lagos

  • a priest for 27.9 years
  • a bishop for 14.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 29 Oct 2013