Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Christopher Shaman Abba

Deceased

Bishop of Yola, Nigeria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Dec 1935Born
16 Dec 196630.9Ordained PriestPriest
17 Sep 197337.7AppointedBishop of Minna, Nigeria
30 Dec 197338.0Ordained BishopBishop of Minna, Nigeria
5 Jul 199660.5AppointedBishop of Yola, Nigeria
10 Jan 201074.0DiedBishop of Yola, Nigeria

MicroData Summary for Christopher Shaman Abba
Bishop Christopher Shaman Abba (born , died ) Bishop of Yola

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMabushi

  • a priest for 43.0 years
  • a bishop for 36.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018