Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles O’Sullivan

Deceased

Bishop of Kerry (o Ardfert) e Aghadoe


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Aug 1858BornBallyfinane
6 Jul 188425.9Ordained PriestPriest of Kerry (o Ardfert) e Aghadoe, Ireland
10 Nov 191759.2AppointedBishop of Kerry (o Ardfert) e Aghadoe, Ireland
27 Jan 191859.4Ordained BishopBishop of Kerry (o Ardfert) e Aghadoe, Ireland
29 Jan 192768.4DiedBishop of Kerry (o Ardfert) e Aghadoe, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Charles O’Sullivan:
Bishop Charles O’Sullivan (born , died ) Bishop of Kerry (o Ardfert) e Aghadoe

  • a priest for 42.6 years
  • a bishop for 9.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1928
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1918, Number 4
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 65

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013