Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ephraim Silas Obot

Deceased

Bishop of Idah


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Oct 1936BornAdiasim
29 Jun 196831.7Ordained PriestPriest of Ikot Ekpene, Nigeria
28 Jun 197134.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Ikot Ekpene, Nigeria
28 Jun 197134.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Iunca in Byzacena
31 Oct 197135.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Iunca in Byzacena
17 Dec 197741.2AppointedBishop of Idah, Nigeria
12 Apr 200972.5DiedBishop of Idah, Nigeria

MicroData Summary for Ephraim Silas Obot:
Bishop Ephraim Silas Obot (born , died ) Bishop of Idah

  • a priest for 40.8 years
  • a bishop for 37.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 200, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013