Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Martin Adjou Moumouni

Bishop of N’Dali, Benin


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jul 1955 Born
16 Jul 198327.9Ordained PriestPriest of Cotonou, Benin
22 Dec 199944.3AppointedBishop of N’Dali, Benin
10 Jun 200044.8Ordained BishopBishop of N’Dali, Benin

MicroData Summary for Martin Adjou Moumouni
Bishop Martin Adjou Moumouni (born ) Bishop of N’Dali

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCotonou

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of N’Dali.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 159, Number 13,780
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 194, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast