Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pedro María Rodríguez Andrade

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Ibagué

Titular Archbishop of Brysis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Feb 1873BornNeivá
27 Apr 189724.1Ordained PriestPriest
10 Apr 192451.1AppointedBishop of Ibagué, Colombia
3 Aug 192451.4Ordained BishopBishop of Ibagué, Colombia
17 Mar 195784.0RetiredBishop of Ibagué, Colombia
17 Mar 195784.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Brysis
5 Nov 196794.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Ibagué, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Pedro María Rodríguez Andrade:
Archbishop Pedro María Rodríguez Andrade (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Ibagué

  • a priest for 70.5 years
  • a bishop for 43.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1924, Number 49

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015