Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Franz Jáchym

Deceased

Coadjutor Bishop Emeritus of Wien {Vienna}, Austria

Titular Archbishop of Maronea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Sep 1910Born
19 Jul 193625.8Ordained PriestPriest of Wien {Vienna}, Austria
20 Jan 195039.3AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Wien {Vienna}, Austria
20 Jan 195039.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Maronea
19 May 195039.7Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Maronea
15 Sep 198373.0ResignedCoadjutor Bishop of Wien {Vienna}, Austria
29 Nov 198474.2DiedCoadjutor Bishop Emeritus of Wien {Vienna}, Austria

MicroData Summary for Franz Jáchym
Archbishop Franz Jáchym (born , died ) Coadjutor Bishop Emeritus of Wien {Vienna}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWien

  • a priest for 48.3 years
  • a bishop for 34.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1950, Number 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast