Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franz Sales Zauner

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Linz, Austria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Dec 1904Born
25 Oct 193126.8Ordained PriestPriest of Linz, Austria
22 Jun 194944.5AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Linz, Austria
22 Jun 194944.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Fata
15 Aug 194944.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Fata
1 Jan 195651.0SucceededBishop of Linz, Austria
15 Aug 198075.6RetiredBishop of Linz, Austria
20 Feb 199489.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Linz, Austria

MicroData Summary for Franz Sales Zauner
Bishop Franz Sales Zauner (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Linz

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGrieskirchen

  • a priest for 62.3 years
  • a bishop for 44.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1949, Number 69

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast