Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ernst Karl Jakob Seydl

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Eucarpia

Auxiliary Bishop of Wien {Vienna}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Oct 1872BornMnischek
24 Jul 189522.8Ordained DeaconDeacon of Wien {Vienna}, Austria
25 Jul 189522.8Ordained PriestPriest of Wien {Vienna}, Austria
30 Sep 191846.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Wien {Vienna}, Austria
30 Sep 191846.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Eucarpia
30 Nov 191846.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Eucarpia
27 Sep 195280.0DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Wien {Vienna}, Austria

MicroData Summary for Ernst Karl Jakob Seydl:
Bishop Ernst Karl Jakob Seydl (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Eucarpia

  • a priest for 57.2 years
  • a bishop for 33.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 168
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1918, Number 58

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013