Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Franz Kamprath

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Wien {Vienna}

Titular Archbishop of Carpathus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Oct 1871BornNeutitschein
25 Jul 189422.7Ordained PriestPriest of Wien {Vienna}, Austria
15 Feb 192957.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Wien {Vienna}, Austria
15 Feb 192957.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Stadia
31 Mar 192957.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Stadia
4 May 194472.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Carpathus
8 Apr 195280.4DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Wien {Vienna}, Austria

MicroData Summary for Franz Kamprath:
Archbishop Franz Kamprath (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Wien {Vienna}

  • a priest for 57.7 years
  • a bishop for 23.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1929, Number 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 19 Jul 2015