Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francesco Imberti

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Vercelli

Titular Archbishop of Vulturia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Dec 1882BornRacconigi
29 Jun 190623.5Ordained PriestPriest
23 Jul 193249.5AppointedBishop of Aosta, Italy
11 Sep 193249.7Ordained BishopBishop of Aosta, Italy
10 Oct 194562.7AppointedArchbishop of Vercelli, Italy
5 Sep 196683.6RetiredArchbishop of Vercelli, Italy
5 Sep 196683.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Vulturia
27 Jan 196784.0DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Vercelli, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Imberti:
Archbishop Francesco Imberti (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Vercelli

  • a priest for 60.5 years
  • a bishop for 34.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1932, Number 64

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015