Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Garneri

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Susa, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Sep 1899Born
29 Jun 192323.7Ordained PriestPriest of Torino {Turin}, Italy
25 Mar 195454.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Susa, Italy
25 Mar 195454.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Utica
23 May 195454.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Utica
2 Jul 195454.7AppointedBishop of Susa, Italy
31 May 197878.7RetiredBishop of Susa, Italy
15 Dec 199899.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Susa, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Garneri
Bishop Giuseppe Garneri (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Susa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCavallermaggiore

  • a priest for 75.4 years
  • a bishop for 44.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1954
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast