Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul Nguyên Thanh Hoan

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Phan Thiết, Viet Nam


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Nov 1939Born
29 Apr 196525.4Ordained PriestPriest
4 Jul 200161.6AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Phan Thiết, Viet Nam
11 Aug 200161.7Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Phan Thiết, Viet Nam
1 Apr 200565.3SucceededBishop of Phan Thiết, Viet Nam
25 Jul 200969.7ResignedBishop of Phan Thiết, Viet Nam
18 Aug 201474.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Phan Thiết, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for Paul Nguyên Thanh Hoan
Bishop Paul Nguyên Thanh Hoan (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Phan Thiết

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNghe An

  • a priest for 49.3 years
  • a bishop for 13.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 25 Jul 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 164, Number 14,015
  • d: CB, 18 Aug 2014
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 221, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast