Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Aleksander Kazimierz Gintowt-Dziewaltowski

Deceased

Archbishop of Mohilev

Apostolic Administrator of Minsk


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Feb 1821BornWoysz-Kany
14 Apr 184524.1Ordained DeaconDeacon
9 Jun 184524.2Ordained PriestPriest
23 Feb 187250.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Płock, Poland
23 Feb 187250.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Helenopolis in Bithynia
18 Aug 187251.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Helenopolis in Bithynia
15 Mar 188362.0AppointedArchbishop of Mohilev, Belarus
15 Mar 188362.0AppointedApostolic Administrator of Minsk, Belarus
26 Aug 188968.5DiedArchbishop of Mohilev, Belarus

MicroData Summary for Aleksander Kazimierz Gintowt-Dziewaltowski:
Archbishop Aleksander Kazimierz Gintowt-Dziewaltowski (born , died ) Archbishop of Mohilev

  • a priest for 44.2 years
  • a bishop for 17.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 301, and Page 387
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 390
  • c34: CB, 8 Jul 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 9 Jul 2015