Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pedro María Vera y Zuria

Deceased

Archbishop of Puebla de los Ángeles, Puebla, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jan 1874Born
18 Dec 189723.9Ordained PriestPriest
2 May 192450.3AppointedArchbishop of Puebla de los Ángeles, Puebla, México
24 Aug 192450.6Ordained BishopArchbishop of Puebla de los Ángeles, Puebla, México
28 Jul 194571.5DiedArchbishop of Puebla de los Ángeles, Puebla, México

MicroData Summary for Pedro María Vera y Zuria
Archbishop Pedro María Vera y Zuria (born , died ) Archbishop of Puebla de los Ángeles, Puebla

EventPlace
Birth PlaceQuerétaro

  • a priest for 47.6 years
  • a bishop for 20.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1924, Number 53

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast