Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franziskus Xaver Hennemann, S.A.C. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Cape Town

Titular Bishop of Coptus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Oct 1882BornHelhausen, Germany
24 Jun 190724.7Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Catholic Apostolate
16 Jul 191330.7AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Cameroun
16 Jul 191330.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Coptus
26 Apr 191431.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Coptus
7 Nov 191432.0SucceededVicar Apostolic of Cameroun
21 Jun 192239.7AppointedPrefect of Cape of Good Hope, Central District {Capo di Buona Speranza, Distretto Centrale}, South Africa
30 Jun 193350.7AppointedVicar Apostolic of Cape of Good Hope, Western District {Capo di Buona Speranza, Distretto Occidentale}, South Africa
13 Jun 193956.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of Cape Town, South Africa
12 Nov 194967.0ResignedVicar Apostolic of Cape Town, South Africa
17 Jan 195168.2DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Cape Town, South Africa

MicroData Summary for Franziskus Xaver Hennemann:
Bishop Franziskus Xaver Hennemann S.A.C. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Cape Town

  • a priest for 43.6 years
  • a bishop for 36.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1914, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013